Loopbaan van Hao Wang
Eerdere bekende functies van Hao Wang
Bedrijven | Functie | Begin | Einde |
---|---|---|---|
ANDATEE CHINA MARINE FUEL SERVICES CORPORATION | Directeur/Bestuurslid | 05-06-2015 | 17-08-2015 |
Algemeen Directeur | 01-11-2012 | 17-08-2015 | |
Voorzitter | 01-11-2012 | 05-06-2015 | |
Financieel Directeur/CFO | 01-11-2012 | 27-12-2013 | |
BOYUAN CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. | Financieel Directeur/CFO | 27-02-2009 | - |
Opleiding van Hao Wang
Dongbei University of Finance & Economics | Undergraduate Degree |
Statistieken
Internationaal
China | 4 |
Operationeel
Director of Finance/CFO | 2 |
Director/Board Member | 1 |
Chief Executive Officer | 1 |
Sectoraal
Energy Minerals | 2 |
Industrial Services | 2 |
Consumer Services | 2 |
Beklede functies
Actief
Inactief
Beursgenoteerde bedrijven
Bedrijven in privébezit
Verwante bedrijven
Beursgenoteerde bedrijven | 1 |
---|---|
ANDATEE CHINA MARINE FUEL SERVICES CORPORATION | Energy Minerals |
Bedrijven in privébezit | 1 |
---|---|
Boyuan Construction Group, Inc.
Boyuan Construction Group, Inc. Engineering & ConstructionIndustrial Services Boyuan Construction Group, Inc. engages in the business of infrastructure and construction. It manages the development and construction of residential and business buildings, municipal infrastructure and engineering projects in China. The company was founded on May 4, 2007 and is headquartered in Zhejiang, China. | Industrial Services |